Zownir, Jerry Roman (CPSO#: 19657)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Ukrainian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Mar 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2015