Zubair, Naeem Ahmad (CPSO#: 72986)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Sep 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Department of Anaesthesia
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone: (905) 623-3331
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zubair Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Zubair ( CPSO# 72986 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Department of Anesthesia
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Sep 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Jul 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 28 Feb 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Oct 2007

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Oct 2007 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Naeem  Ahmad  Zubair may practise independently in the area of Anaesthesia
            only.