Zubovits, Judit Terezia (CPSO#: 74217)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 4850
Fax: 416 281-7486
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Zubovits Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zubovits ( CPSO# 74217 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDIT TEREZIA ZUBOVITS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZUBOVITS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2000