Zucconi, Anthony Peter (CPSO#: 68213)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
359 Riverside Drive
Suite 108
Sudbury ON  P3E 1H5
Phone: (705) 688-1359
Fax: (705) 688-1422
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Zucconi and Sharon Terada, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zucconi ( CPSO# 68213 )
Dr. S. Terada ( CPSO# 68198 )

Business Address:
108 - 359 Riverside Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1H5
Phone Number: (705) 688-1359

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY PETER ZUCCONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZUCCONI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1996