Zuker Grossman, Sharon Ruth (CPSO#: 44429)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994