Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Zukor, David Joseph (CPSO#: 55994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jewish General Hospital
Chief Dept of Orthopedic Surgery
Pav E 003
3755 Cote St Catherine
Montreal QC  H3T 1E2
Phone: (514) 340-8222 Ext. 2995
Fax: (514) 340-7595

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JOSEPH ZUKOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZUKOR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1985