Zunder, Ian Howard Lindsay (CPSO#: 57058)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Anaesthesia
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Site
249C
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4169
Fax: (613) 761-5209
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian H. Zunder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Zunder ( CPSO# 57058 )

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Suite 249C
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4169

Business Address:
301 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V6
Phone Number: (613) 563-3800

Business Address:
Revisage
1655 Kilborn Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1H 6M7
Phone Number: (613) 828-2230

Business Address:
Argylle Associates
Suite 100
2255 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7Z5

Business Address:
Star Endoscopy
Unit 201
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone Number: (613) 729-3179

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN HOWARD LINDSAY ZUNDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZUNDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1987