Zuniga Avendano, Alvaro Alfonso (CPSO#: 87883)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad De Los Andes (Chile), 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2007 to 22 Feb 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 23 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009