Zur, Daniel (CPSO#: 31089)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Zur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 4 100 Highland Road West Kitchener, ON N2M 3B5
Instructions: Medical Records with Dr. Kevin Mayer
Date Received: 15 May 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 1909
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1979