Zutshi, Karan (CPSO#: 57322)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kashmiri, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Kashmir University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
193 Strathearn Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 2S7
Phone: (905) 884-2021
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zutshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Zutshi ( CPSO# 57322 )

Business Address:
193 Strathearn Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 2S7
Phone Number: (905) 884-2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARAN ZUTSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZUTSHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1988