Zwimpfer, Thomas Joseph (CPSO#: 52564)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Sep 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Sep 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 04 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Sep 1993