Zylberberg Serman, Alejandro Daniel (CPSO#: 94723)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Catholic University of Chile, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2011 to 25 Feb 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 26 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2011