Zypchen, Leslie Nicole (CPSO#: 71117)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 21 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 05 Jan 2004 to 31 Jan 2004
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2005