da Rosa Borges, Bruno Cesar (CPSO#: 87932)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Feb 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal De Pernambuco, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75166
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: da Rosa Borges Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. da Rosa Borges ( CPSO# 87932 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 802-7945

Business Address:
Juravinski Medical Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 802-7945

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 802-7945

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Brazil

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jul 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Feb 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 14 Mar 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 15 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Bruno Cesar da Rosa Borges may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Anaesthesia, McMaster University, in which Dr. da Rosa Borges holds
                        an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. da Rosa
                  Borges no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.