de Boer, Aglaia Kaissa (CPSO#: 88390)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Respirology
501 Smyth Road Box 211
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8198
Fax: (613) 737-8537
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 07 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AGLAIA KAISSA DE BOER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE BOER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2012