de Guzman, Ruby (CPSO#: 27957)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 26 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Formoso-de Guzman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. de Guzman ( CPSO# 27957 )
Dr. A. Formoso ( CPSO# 31142 )

Business Address:
Merivale Medical Imaging Inc
1370 Clyde Avenue
Nepean ON  K2G 3H8
Phone Number: (613) 727-1072

Business Address:
838 Somerset Street
Suite 30
Ottawa ON  K1R 6R7
Phone Number: (613) 680-8380

Medical Records Location

Address: 1179 Plante Dr Ottawa ON K1V 9E9
Date Received: 26 Mar 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Mar 2018