de Jesus, Christopher Filemon (CPSO#: 107237)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201 Deacon Street
Tower C - C102
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6
Phone: 613-732-2164
Fax: 613-732-2158
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pembroke General Hospital
705 Mackay St
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Canada
Phone: (613) 732-2811
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: de Jesus Legare-Archambault Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Legare-Archambault ( CPSO# 110031)
Dr. C. de Jesus ( CPSO# 107237)

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 26 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER FILEMON DE JESUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE JESUS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 26 Jul 2015
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2015