de Kleer, Nancy Mary Ann (CPSO#: 71579)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 31
1495 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 0B2
Phone: (905) 901-9545
Fax: (905) 901-9643
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

520 Locust Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1V2
Canada
Phone: 905 634-5573
Fax: 905 634-5406
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. de Kleer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. de Kleer ( CPSO# 71579 )

Business Address:
Suite 31
1495 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 0B2
Phone Number: (905) 901-9545

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY MARY ANN DE KLEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE KLEER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Nov 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On July 16, 2012, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Milton, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. de Kleer.