de Montbrun, Sandra Lynn (CPSO#: 87856)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Colorectal Surgery
Cardinal Carter Wing Room 16 064
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5005
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sandra de Montbrun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. de Montbrun ( CPSO# 87856 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Colorectal Surgery
Cardinal Carter Wing Room 16 064
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5005

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA LYNN DE MONTBRUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE MONTBRUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Nov 2007 to 04 Jan 2008
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009