de Nanassy, Joseph Arpad (CPSO#: 56516)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 01 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Szeged, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Anatomical Pathology
Laboratory P S U
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2897
Fax: (613) 738-4837
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH ARPAD DE NANASSY may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF PATHOLOGY AND LABORATORY MEDICINE, UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA in which Dr. DE NANASSY holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. DE NANASSY may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. DE NANASSY no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. DE NANASSY no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. DE NANASSY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Dec 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 31 Dec 1986
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2004