de Sa, Derek John (CPSO#: 41851)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 19 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Sep 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007