de Silva, Lande Bandarage Pujitha Prasad (CPSO#: 88610)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala

Education:University of Colombo, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1476 Aldersbrook Road
London ON  N6G 0P5
Phone: (519) 474-7300
Fax: (519) 474-7309
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: De Silva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. de Silva ( CPSO# 88610 )

Business Address:
1476 Aldersbrook Road
London ON  N6G 0P5
Phone Number: (519) 474-7300

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Aug 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LANDE BANDARAGE PUJITHA PRASAD DE SILVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE SILVA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2010