de Souza, Fructuoso Martinho Jose Antonio (CPSO#: 23875)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F.M. de Souza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 3 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Limited Head Office Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Toll Free: 1-800-775-0093 www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 30 Jun 2014


Address: Records Management Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933 2904 E-mail: info@recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 23 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2015