de Vasconcelos Fernandes, Ricardo Augusto (CPSO#: 104264)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:UNIVERSIDADE GAMA FILHO, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
790 Commisioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 52764
Fax: 519-685-8808
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Ricardo Augusto de Vasconcelos Fernandes may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Oncology,
                        Division of Medical Oncology, University of Western Ontario, in
                        which Dr. de Vasconcelos Fernandes holds an academic appointment at
                        the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. de Vasconcelos Fernandes no longer holds
                  the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes
                  first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr.  De Vasconcelos
                        Fernandes' clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,
                        professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr.  de Vasconcelos
                        Fernandes' certificate of registration, following consideration of
                        the practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 5, 2017, and expires on June 30,
                  2020.  Upon renewal of Dr. de Vasconcelos Fernandes' academic appointment
                  at the University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended,
                  subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.