de Veber, Hilary Ruth Helen (CPSO#: 70109)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
840 Coxwell Avenue, suite 219
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 696-0003
Fax: (416) 696-0022
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

825 Coxwell Ave.
Toronto East General Hospital
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 469-6590
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HILARY RUTH HELEN DE VEBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE VEBER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000