de Veber, Leverett Lebaron (CPSO#: 15163)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Nov 1959 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1955
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 06 Nov 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 2006