de Wit, Kerstin Elizabeth (CPSO#: 94402)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: Hogg, Kerstin Elizabeth (used until: 10 Mar 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 07 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KERSTIN ELIZABETH DE WIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE WIT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2010 to 26 Oct 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 27 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2014