van Adel, Brian Anthony (CPSO#: 83382)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster Wing HGH
Room 711
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46373
Fax: (905) 577-8036
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian van Adel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 4 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN ANTHONY VAN ADEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN ADEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 04 Aug 2008 to 03 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

McMaster University, 04 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2011