van Klei, Wilhelmus Antonie (CPSO#: 84058)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:State University of Utrecht, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2006 to 31 Mar 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2007 to 30 Apr 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2007