van Rensburg, Adriaan Esias (CPSO#: 78817)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Stellenbosch, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street EN 3 464
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 715-7595
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adriaan Van Rensburg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. van Rensburg ( CPSO# 78817 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street EN 3 464
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 715-7595

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

South Africa
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIAAN ESIAS VAN RENSBURG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN RENSBURG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 28 Mar 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 29 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2008