von Both, Ingo Lars Volker (CPSO#: 94041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Johannes Gutenberg University at Mainz, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Forensic Pathology Service
Provincial Forensic Pathology Unit
Room 2-415
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone: (647) 821-8921
Fax: (416) 314-4060
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Pathology Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INGO LARS VOLKER VON BOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VON BOTH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015