von Dadelszen, Peter (CPSO#: 70458)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Otago, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1998
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1999
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jan 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Nov 2000