Regulated Clinic Inspections Detail

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

<<Back to Listing

Rothbart Centre for Pain Care

Current Business Address:
4646 Dufferin Street
Unit 9
Toronto Ontario M3H 5S4

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Dec 08, 2016 Pending
Sep 17, 2014 Pass View PDF
Apr 22, 2014 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Oct 15, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 05, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Dec 21, 2011 Pass View PDF

Need Assistance?


Call the Public & Physician Advisory Service, weekdays from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m., 416-967-2603  or  1-800-268-7096 ext 603

Email us

 

Get Adobe Reader

You must have Adobe Reader installed in order to view PDF documents.