Regulated Clinic Inspections Detail

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

<<Back to Listing

Brampton Cosmetic Surgery Center & Medical Spa

Current Business Address:
145 Queen Street East
Suite 400
Brampton Ontario L6W 3P8

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jul 27, 2017 Pending
Dec 22, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Feb 10, 2016 Pass View PDF
Dec 02, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jul 09, 2012 Pass View PDF

Need Assistance?


Call the Public & Physician Advisory Service, weekdays from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m., 416-967-2603  or  1-800-268-7096 ext 603

Email us

 

Get Adobe Reader

You must have Adobe Reader installed in order to view PDF documents.