Regulated Clinic Inspections Detail

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

<<Back to Listing

Promed Endoscopy Clinic

Current Business Address:
1315 Finch Avenue West
Suite 302
North York Ontario M3J 2G6

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jul 18, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 02, 2016 Pass View PDF
Nov 20, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jan 07, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
May 07, 2012 Pass View PDF

Need Assistance?


Call the Public & Physician Advisory Service, weekdays from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m., 416-967-2603  or  1-800-268-7096 ext 603

Email us

 

Get Adobe Reader

You must have Adobe Reader installed in order to view PDF documents.