Regulated Clinic Inspections Detail

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

<<Back to Listing

Clarity Eye Institute

Current Business Address:
Unit A7
9135 Keele Street
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0J4

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Nov 01, 2017 Pending
Oct 27, 2017 Pass View PDF
Nov 21, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 03, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jul 21, 2011 Pass View PDF

Need Assistance?


Call the Public & Physician Advisory Service, weekdays from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m., 416-967-2603  or  1-800-268-7096 ext 603

Email us

 

Get Adobe Reader

You must have Adobe Reader installed in order to view PDF documents.