Regulated Clinic Inspections Detail

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

<<Back to Listing

Capilia by Regency Medical Hair Centre

Current Business Address:
595 Montreal Road
Suite 303
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
May 03, 2017 Pending
Feb 10, 2016 Pass View PDF
Dec 02, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 10, 2014 Pass View PDF
Dec 02, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 05, 2012 Pass View PDF

Need Assistance?


Call the Public & Physician Advisory Service, weekdays from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m., 416-967-2603  or  1-800-268-7096 ext 603

Email us

 

Get Adobe Reader

You must have Adobe Reader installed in order to view PDF documents.