Regulated Clinic Inspections Detail

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

<<Back to Listing

Ottawa Endoscopy and Day Surgery Centre

Current Business Address:
267 O'Connor Street
Suite 207
Ottawa Ontario K2P 1V3

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jan 18, 2017 Pass View PDF
Nov 17, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Nov 01, 2016 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Oct 20, 2016 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Apr 30, 2012 Pass View PDF

Need Assistance?


Call the Public & Physician Advisory Service, weekdays from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m., 416-967-2603  or  1-800-268-7096 ext 603

Email us

 

Get Adobe Reader

You must have Adobe Reader installed in order to view PDF documents.