Regulated Clinic Inspections Detail

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

<<Back to Listing

TLC Vision (Canada) Corp. TLC Yonge Eglinton

Current Business Address:
2345 Yonge Street
Suite 212
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E5

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Nov 20, 2014 Pass View PDF
Sep 05, 2014 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jun 25, 2014 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jun 10, 2013 Pass View PDF
Jan 23, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF

Need Assistance?


Call the Public & Physician Advisory Service, weekdays from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m., 416-967-2603  or  1-800-268-7096 ext 603

Email us

 

Get Adobe Reader

You must have Adobe Reader installed in order to view PDF documents.