Regulated Clinic Inspections Detail

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

<<Back to Listing

Windsor Essex County Comprehensive Pain Clinic

Current Business Address:
2525 Roseville Garden Drive
Suite 302
Windsor Ontario N8T 3J8

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Feb 10, 2016 Pass View PDF
Dec 02, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jun 10, 2013 Pass View PDF
Mar 21, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 07, 2012 Pass with Conditions View PDF

Need Assistance?


Call the Public & Physician Advisory Service, weekdays from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m., 416-967-2603  or  1-800-268-7096 ext 603

Email us

 

Get Adobe Reader

You must have Adobe Reader installed in order to view PDF documents.