Regulated Clinic Inspections Detail

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

<<Back to Listing

Rudd Clinic

Current Business Address:
123 Edward Street
Suite 400
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E2

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Sep 27, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Oct 18, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Dec 01, 2015 Pass View PDF
Oct 19, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jan 31, 2014 Pass View PDF
Nov 12, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 09, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Nov 04, 2011 Pass View PDF

Need Assistance?


Call the Public & Physician Advisory Service, weekdays from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m., 416-967-2603  or  1-800-268-7096 ext 603

Email us

 

Get Adobe Reader

You must have Adobe Reader installed in order to view PDF documents.