Regulated Clinic Inspections Detail

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

<<Back to Listing

The Centre for Personal Surgery

Current Business Address:
520 Locust Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 1V2

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Mar 30, 2017 Pass View PDF
Apr 07, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 06, 2016 Pass View PDF
Dec 02, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Dec 19, 2011 Pass View PDF

Need Assistance?


Call the Public & Physician Advisory Service, weekdays from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m., 416-967-2603  or  1-800-268-7096 ext 603

Email us

 

Get Adobe Reader

You must have Adobe Reader installed in order to view PDF documents.