Regulated Clinic Inspections Detail

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

<<Back to Listing

Woodbine Endoscopy

Current Business Address:
100 Renfrew Drive
Suite 130
Markham Ontario L3R 9R6

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Oct 18, 2017 Withdrawal
Oct 04, 2017 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Sep 07, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jul 27, 2017 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Apr 27, 2015 Pass View PDF
Mar 05, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 28, 2012 Pass View PDF

Need Assistance?


Call the Public & Physician Advisory Service, weekdays from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m., 416-967-2603  or  1-800-268-7096 ext 603

Email us

 

Get Adobe Reader

You must have Adobe Reader installed in order to view PDF documents.