Regulated Clinic Inspections Detail

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

<<Back to Listing

London Scoping Centre

Current Business Address:
310 Wellington Road South
London Ontario N6C 4P4

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Mar 31, 2017 Pass View PDF
Mar 23, 2017 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Apr 07, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Feb 09, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Oct 19, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Aug 31, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jan 23, 2013 Pass View PDF

Need Assistance?


Call the Public & Physician Advisory Service, weekdays from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m., 416-967-2603  or  1-800-268-7096 ext 603

Email us

 

Get Adobe Reader

You must have Adobe Reader installed in order to view PDF documents.