Regulated Clinic Inspections Detail

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

<<Back to Listing

Downsview Endoscopy Clinic

Current Business Address:
1635 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 201
Toronto Ontario M6L 3C9

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Nov 01, 2017 Pending
Oct 27, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
May 17, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jul 15, 2015 Pass View PDF
May 25, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jan 23, 2013 Pass View PDF

Need Assistance?


Call the Public & Physician Advisory Service, weekdays from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m., 416-967-2603  or  1-800-268-7096 ext 603

Email us

 

Get Adobe Reader

You must have Adobe Reader installed in order to view PDF documents.