Regulated Clinic Inspections Detail

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

<<Back to Listing

Kingston Medical Centre

Current Business Address:
725 Arlington Park Place
Kingston Ontario K7M 7E4

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Apr 24, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Nov 21, 2016 Pass View PDF
Apr 07, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 16, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Aug 15, 2012 Pass View PDF

Need Assistance?


Call the Public & Physician Advisory Service, weekdays from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m., 416-967-2603  or  1-800-268-7096 ext 603

Email us

 

Get Adobe Reader

You must have Adobe Reader installed in order to view PDF documents.