Regulated Clinic Inspections Detail

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

<<Back to Listing

Barrie Endoscopy Clinic

Current Business Address:
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Lower Level 1
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Oct 27, 2017 Pass View PDF
Sep 07, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jul 24, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jul 10, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Aug 23, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 30, 2012 Pass View PDF

Need Assistance?


Call the Public & Physician Advisory Service, weekdays from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m., 416-967-2603  or  1-800-268-7096 ext 603

Email us

 

Get Adobe Reader

You must have Adobe Reader installed in order to view PDF documents.