Regulated Clinic Inspections Detail

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

<<Back to Listing

FACE Cosmetic Surgery

Current Business Address:
251 Davenport Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 1J9

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jul 18, 2017 Pass View PDF
May 25, 2015 Pass View PDF
Mar 05, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 10, 2014 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jan 23, 2013 Pass View PDF

Need Assistance?


Call the Public & Physician Advisory Service, weekdays from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m., 416-967-2603  or  1-800-268-7096 ext 603

Email us

 

Get Adobe Reader

You must have Adobe Reader installed in order to view PDF documents.