Regulated Clinic Inspections Detail

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

<<Back to Listing

Toronto Plastic Surgery Institute

Current Business Address:
6 Maginn Mews
Suite 204
Toronto Ontario M3C 0G9

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jun 26, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jun 20, 2016 Pass View PDF
Mar 21, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jun 24, 2015 Pass View PDF
May 25, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jun 08, 2012 Pass View PDF

Need Assistance?


Call the Public & Physician Advisory Service, weekdays from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m., 416-967-2603  or  1-800-268-7096 ext 603

Email us

 

Get Adobe Reader

You must have Adobe Reader installed in order to view PDF documents.