Regulated Clinic Inspections Detail

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

<<Back to Listing

Tri City Colonoscopy Clinic

Current Business Address:
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Unit 200
Kitchener Ontario N2P 0A4

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jan 12, 2018 Pending
Apr 24, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Oct 19, 2015 Pass View PDF
Aug 31, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 27, 2012 Pass View PDF

Need Assistance?


Call the Public & Physician Advisory Service, weekdays from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m., 416-967-2603  or  1-800-268-7096 ext 603

Email us

 

Get Adobe Reader

You must have Adobe Reader installed in order to view PDF documents.